WA HB2967 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Assisting Washington families by improving the fairness of the state's tax system by enacting a capital gains tax and providing property tax relief.
Title
Assisting Washington families by improving the fairness of the state's tax system by enacting a capital gains tax and providing property tax relief.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristine Lytton [D] | Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] |
Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-19 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-19 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |