WA HB2961 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a statewide electronic tracking system for the nonprescription sales of ephedrine, pseudoephedrine, and phenylpropanolamine.
Title
Establishing a statewide electronic tracking system for the nonprescription sales of ephedrine, pseudoephedrine, and phenylpropanolamine.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Campbell [R] | Rep. Christopher Hurst [D] | Rep. Troy Kelley [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] |
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-23 | Chapter 182, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-23 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-08 | Passed final passage; yeas, 84; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-08 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-05 | Floor amendment | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-01 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | HEA - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-24 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 8:30 AM. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. | |
2010-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 74; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-13 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-13 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-05 | APPH - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-05 | APPH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-05 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health & Human Services Appropriations at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-04 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health & Human Services Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Health & Human Services Appropriations. | |
2010-01-29 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-01-29 | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-29 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-29 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-26 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-19 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6642 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.