WA HB2957 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing escape of nonnative finfish from marine finfish aquaculture facilities.
Title
Reducing escape of nonnative finfish from marine finfish aquaculture facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-22 | House | Chapter 179, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-22 | House | Governor partially vetoed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 16; absent, 1; excused, 1. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2018-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 31; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-14 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-14 | House | 1st substitute bill not substituted. |
2018-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | AGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |