WA HB2952 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning officially naming a recreational trail.
Title
Concerning officially naming a recreational trail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |