WA HB2951 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Ordering a study to determine how to increase reporting and investigation of missing Native American women.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ordering a study to determine how to increase reporting and investigation of missing Native American women.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-15HouseChapter 101, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-15HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-08HouseDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-07SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03HousePassed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-03-03HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2018-03-01SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-03-01SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-03-01SenateFloor amendment
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-26SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2018-02-21SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2018-02-20SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2018-02-20SenateSGTE - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 6:00 PM.
2018-02-16SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-09SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
2018-02-07HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-07HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-07House1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-06HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-01HouseCDHT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-01HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-30HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-29HouseFirst reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback