WA HB2945 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning aerospace business and occupation taxes and world trade organization compliance.
Title
Concerning aerospace business and occupation taxes and world trade organization compliance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-27 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6690 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-25 - Effective date 3/25/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2945&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2945.pdf |