WA HB2944 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-12)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Safeguarding the public safety by protecting railroad workers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safeguarding the public safety by protecting railroad workers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2018-02-09HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-06HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-06HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-06HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Labor & Workplace Standards.
2018-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2018-02-01HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-01HouseLAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-01HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:30 AM.
2018-01-30HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-26HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback