WA HB2940 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Making the business and occupation tax more progressive.
Title
Making the business and occupation tax more progressive.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristine Lytton [D] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] |
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-05 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-26 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |