WA HB2938 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning campaign finance law enforcement and reporting.
Title
Concerning campaign finance law enforcement and reporting.
Sponsors
Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-28 | House | Chapter 304, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-28 | House | Governor partially vetoed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 92; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-03-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 6:00 PM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2018-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-14 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-14 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-06 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-06 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by State Government, Elections & Information Technology. |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-02-02 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-02 | House | SEIT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-26 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |