WA HB2931 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a sales and use tax exemption for labor and services rendered related to and tangible personal property incorporated in a qualified community multipurpose arts and events facility.
Title
Providing a sales and use tax exemption for labor and services rendered related to and tangible personal property incorporated in a qualified community multipurpose arts and events facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-07 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2931&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2931.pdf |