WA HB2927 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning highly capable students.
Title
Concerning highly capable students.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] |
Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-30 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
Same As/Similar To
SB6508 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-22 - First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.