WA HB2919 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adjusting the amount and use of county fees on the real estate excise tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adjusting the amount and use of county fees on the real estate excise tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03HouseGovernor vetoed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-11HousePassed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-11HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-10SenateCommittee amendment
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-10SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-09SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-03-09SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-09SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-03-02SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-28SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-28SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-28SenateHSA - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 8:30 AM.
2020-02-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability.
2020-02-19HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-19HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-19HouseFloor amendment
2020-02-19House1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-12HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-07HouseFIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-07HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-04HousePublic hearing scheduled, but not heard in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2919&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2919.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2919-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2919-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2919-S.PL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=122325&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-19-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2919&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=122325&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-10-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2919&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=122325&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-11-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2919&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback