WA HB2903 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that qualified dealer cash incentives paid to auto dealers are bona fide discounts for purposes of the business and occupation tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing that qualified dealer cash incentives paid to auto dealers are bona fide discounts for purposes of the business and occupation tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03HouseGovernor vetoed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-11SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 2; excused, 1.
2020-03-11SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-10SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-09SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-03-09SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2020-03-09SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-03-02SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-03-02SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-27HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-27HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-26HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-07HouseFIN - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-07HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-04HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-30HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.

Same As/Similar To

SB6654 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-02 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback