WA HB2896 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of surplus property for public benefit.
Title
Concerning the use of surplus property for public benefit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 8:30 AM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
2020-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | HOUS - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |