WA HB2890 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Promoting successful reentry by modifying the process for obtaining certificates of discharge and vacating conviction records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting successful reentry by modifying the process for obtaining certificates of discharge and vacating conviction records.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-01HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-01HousePS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-01HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-30HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-23HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-22HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback