WA HB2875 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning sales, use, and excise tax exemptions for self-help housing development.
Title
Concerning sales, use, and excise tax exemptions for self-help housing development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-05 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB6557 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-02 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2875&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2875.pdf |