WA HB2873 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning families in conflict.
Title
Concerning families in conflict.
Sponsors
Rep. Jesse Johnson [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Lisa Callan [D] |
Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | House | Chapter 51, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services & Early Learning. |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6611 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.