WA HB2868 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing for extensions of the special valuation of historic property for certain properties.
Title
Allowing for extensions of the special valuation of historic property for certain properties.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-19 | House | Chapter 91, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-28 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |