WA HB2867 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the calculation of interest associated with annual tax reporting periods without making any changes to the interest rate.
Title
Concerning the calculation of interest associated with annual tax reporting periods without making any changes to the interest rate.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |