WA HB2861 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the provision of trauma-informed child care.
Title
Expanding the provision of trauma-informed child care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-22 | House | Chapter 231, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2018-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 70; nays, 27; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-02 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |