WA HB2861 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding state certified court reporters to the list of persons authorized to administer oaths and affirmations.
Title
Adding state certified court reporters to the list of persons authorized to administer oaths and affirmations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-17 | Chapter 98, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-17 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-05 | President signed. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | JUD - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-26 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-10 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-01 | JUDI - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-01 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-01 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-28 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-15 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |