WA HB2854 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing pilot programs to plan for the needs of certain college students experiencing homelessness.
Title
Establishing pilot programs to plan for the needs of certain college students experiencing homelessness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-31 | House | HE - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2854&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2854.pdf |