WA HB2853 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a retail sales and use tax exemption for qualified donations to the Washington excellence fund.
Title
Providing a retail sales and use tax exemption for qualified donations to the Washington excellence fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Morris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-05 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |