WA HB2851 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the calculation of military leave for officers and employees that work shifts spanning more than one calendar day.
Title
Clarifying the calculation of military leave for officers and employees that work shifts spanning more than one calendar day.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] |
Rep. Larry Haler [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-15 | House | Chapter 99, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2018-02-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-25 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |