WA HB2848 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Changing the expiration date for the sales and use tax exemption of hog fuel to coincide with the 2045 deadline for fossil fuel-free electrical generation in Washington state and to protect jobs with health care and retirement benefits in economically distressed communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changing the expiration date for the sales and use tax exemption of hog fuel to coincide with the 2045 deadline for fossil fuel-free electrical generation in Washington state and to protect jobs with health care and retirement benefits in economically distressed communities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03HouseGovernor vetoed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-11HousePassed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-11HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-10SenateCommittee amendment
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-10SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-09SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-03-09SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-09SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-03-02SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-28SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-27SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-27SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-27SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-27SenateENET - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-20SenatePublic hearing scheduled, but not heard in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-17SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
2020-02-13HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-02-13HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-12HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-07HouseFIN - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-07HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-27HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.

Same As/Similar To

SB6665 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-20 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2848&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2848.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2848.PL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=122067&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-13-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2848&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=122067&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-10-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2848&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=122067&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-11-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2848&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback