WA HB2848 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying school and court processes to promote attendance and reduce truancy.
Title
Modifying school and court processes to promote attendance and reduce truancy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-30 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-30 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Education |