WA HB2843 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing joint self-insurance programs for property and liability risks.
Title
Addressing joint self-insurance programs for property and liability risks.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Kirby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-26 | House | BFS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 9:00 AM. |
2018-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB6443 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.