WA HB2842 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Financing of improvements for state-owned lands to be transferred for private development.
Title
Financing of improvements for state-owned lands to be transferred for private development.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Schmick [R] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Terry Nealey [R] | Rep. Chris Reykdal [D] |
Rep. Mary Dye [R] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | House | Chapter 192, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-08 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2016-02-04 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 9:30 AM. |
2016-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB6580 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.