WA HB2842 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing confidentiality as it relates to insurer receivership.
Title
Addressing confidentiality as it relates to insurer receivership.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-17 | Chapter 97, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-17 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-05 | President signed. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-25 | FIHI - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-23 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-12 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-12 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-21 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-01-21 | FII - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-21 | FII - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-21 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-15 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |