WA HB2839 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an alternative form of regulation of electrical and natural gas companies.
Title
Authorizing an alternative form of regulation of electrical and natural gas companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | EENT - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology. |
2018-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-09 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-06 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-02-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-01 | House | TED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
Same As/Similar To
SB6424 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.