WA HB2836 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Delineating charity care and notice requirements without restricting charity care.
Title
Delineating charity care and notice requirements without restricting charity care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-31 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |