WA HB2834 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing an identicard program to provide individuals a Washington state issued identicard.
Title
Implementing an identicard program to provide individuals a Washington state issued identicard.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Harris [R] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] |
Rep. Mike Steele [R] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Rep. Lauren Davis [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-08 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6426 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-29 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2834&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2834.pdf |