WA HB2834 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning implementation of the homeless youth prevention and protection act of 2015.
Title
Concerning implementation of the homeless youth prevention and protection act of 2015.
Sponsors
Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] |
Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-15 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2016-02-15 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-15 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-15 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-02-15 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-05 | House | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 9:00 AM. |
2016-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |