WA HB2828 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Effective date 3/18/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Effective date 3/18/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring hospitals to report certain health care data.
Title
Requiring hospitals to report certain health care data.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Effective date 3/18/2010. | |
2010-03-18 | Chapter 113, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-18 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-05 | President signed. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-03-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | HEA - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-22 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-12 | Committee recommendations adopted and the 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-29 | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-29 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-29 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-26 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-14 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |