WA HB2827 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-26 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 9:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-26 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 9:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring minimum liability insurance coverage for certain towing expenses.
Title
Requiring minimum liability insurance coverage for certain towing expenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Kirby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 9:00 AM. |
2018-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB6455 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-25 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:30 AM.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2827&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2827.pdf |