WA HB2823 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning postsecondary institution policy on gift equity packaging.
Title
Concerning postsecondary institution policy on gift equity packaging.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-30 | House | Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2823&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2823.pdf |