WA HB2822 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 1/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 1/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning service animals.
Title
Concerning service animals.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Steele [R] | Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. Norm Johnson [R] |
Rep. Michelle Caldier [R] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Effective date 1/1/2019. |
2018-03-22 | House | Chapter 176, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2018-02-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |