WA HB2808 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 7/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Effective date 7/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning vehicle dealer licensing.
Title
Concerning vehicle dealer licensing.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Effective date 7/1/2018. |
2018-03-27 | House | Chapter 273, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2018-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-24 | House | BFS - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |