WA HB2800 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Correcting a double amendment concerning county legislative authorities.
Title
Correcting a double amendment concerning county legislative authorities.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Haler [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | House | Chapter 189, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | GOS - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |
2016-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-03 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |