WA HB2797 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the sales and use tax for affordable and supportive housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the sales and use tax for affordable and supportive housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-03HouseGovernor vetoed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-12HousePassed final passage; yeas, 61; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-12HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-03-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-12SenateCommittee amendment
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-03-10SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-03-09SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-03-09SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-03-09SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-09SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2020-03-02SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-28SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-28SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-28SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-28SenateHSA - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 8:30 AM.
2020-02-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability.
2020-02-16HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-02-16HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-16HouseFloor amendment
2020-02-14HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-11HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-11HouseFIN - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-07HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-22HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.

Same As/Similar To

SB6631 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Referred to Ways & Means.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2797&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2797.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2797.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2797.PL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121873&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-16-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2797&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121873&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-12-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2797&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121873&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-12-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2797&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback