WA HB2793 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying and expanding the rights and obligations of state registered domestic partners and other couples related to parentage.
Title
Clarifying and expanding the rights and obligations of state registered domestic partners and other couples related to parentage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-22 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-22 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-18 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-17 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2010-02-15 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 59; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-02-15 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-15 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-15 | 2nd substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-13 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-08 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-08 | WAYS - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-08 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-08 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2010-02-01 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-01-21 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-01-21 | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-21 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-21 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-14 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |