WA HB2791 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning faith-based exemptions regarding criminal mistreatment of children and vulnerable adults.
Title
Concerning faith-based exemptions regarding criminal mistreatment of children and vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-01 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-18 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |