WA HB2786 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning membership in the law enforcement officers' and firefighters' retirement system plan 2 for firefighters employed by the department of corrections or the department of social and health services and serving at a prison or civil commitment center located on an island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning membership in the law enforcement officers' and firefighters' retirement system plan 2 for firefighters employed by the department of corrections or the department of social and health services and serving at a prison or civil commitment center located on an island.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-22HouseChapter 230, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-22HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-08HouseDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-01SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-03-01SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-26SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-26SenateMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-26SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2018-02-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2018-02-13HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-13HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-13House1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-09HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-06HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-06HouseAPP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback