WA HB2778 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning community redevelopment financing in apportionment districts.
Title
Concerning community redevelopment financing in apportionment districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Sullivan [D] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Drew Stokesbary [R] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] |
Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Sen. Matt Boehnke [R] | Rep. Keith Goehner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2778&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2778.pdf |