WA HB2775 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding membership on the state building code council.
Title
Regarding membership on the state building code council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-04-01 | Chapter 275, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-04-01 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-04 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-01 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | GO - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-12 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2010-02-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2010-02-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-10 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-29 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-27 | LGH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-27 | LGH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-27 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-21 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-13 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. |