WA HB2771 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Managing wolves using translocation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Managing wolves using translocation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2018-02-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
2018-02-13HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-13HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-13HouseFloor amendment
2018-02-13House1st substitute bill substituted
2018-02-06HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-01HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-02-01HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-01HouseAGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-01HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-31HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback