WA HB2766 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning nursing assistant credentialing.
Title
Concerning nursing assistant credentialing.
Sponsors
Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. John Driscoll [D] | Rep. Tami Green [D] |
Rep. Bill Hinkle [R] | Rep. Marcie Maxwell [D] | Sen. Sharon Nelson [D] | Rep. Eric Pettigrew [D] |
Rep. Mahlon Priest [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-13 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6582 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-23 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2766&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2766.pdf |