WA HB2765 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the limited authority of park rangers.
Title
Clarifying the limited authority of park rangers.
Sponsors
Rep. Joel Kretz [R] | Rep. Luis Moscoso [D] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Dave Hayes [R] |
Sen. Jeff Holy [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | House | Chapter 185, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 5:30 PM. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2016-02-15 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-15 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-15 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2016-02-05 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |