WA HB2758 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning diaper changing stations at restaurants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning diaper changing stations at restaurants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-01-31HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-01-31HouseBFS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-31HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-26HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 9:00 AM.
2018-01-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Business & Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

SB6401 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-15 - First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback