WA HB2758 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the use of an ordinance to advise the county governing body of a city's preliminary intent regarding inclusion or exclusion from a public transportation benefit area.
Title
Requiring the use of an ordinance to advise the county governing body of a city's preliminary intent regarding inclusion or exclusion from a public transportation benefit area.
Sponsors
Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] | Rep. Melanie Stambaugh [R] |
Rep. Jessyn Farrell [D] | Rep. Drew Stokesbary [R] | Rep. JD Rossetti [D] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-26 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-08 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-08 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2758&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2758.pdf |